Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Segraves, John, Segraves, Susan, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Grossman, David Scott, King, Robert Richard, against Walmart, Inc, represented by Grennan, Philip B., in the jurisdiction of Walla Walla County, WA, . Walla Walla County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2019 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWalla Walla County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule stipulated |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial Date Jury Trial March 28-April 3, 2023 |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Substitution of Counsel Robert R King |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address def's counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.