Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Perry, Michael S, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Valley Empire Collection, represented by Case, Mark Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Walla Walla County, WA, . Walla Walla County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2021 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWalla Walla County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal
Judge: Wolfram, M. Scott |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment
Judge: Lohrmann, John W |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing motion to dismiss voluntarily Judge: Wolfram, M. Scott |
|
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing Cancelled Courts Request | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response - Defendants |
|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.