Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Thorsnes, John, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Stevens, Jonathan Charles, against Does, 1-5, J & J Golf, Llc, Pliska, James, represented by Jensen, Scott L., in the jurisdiction of Walla Walla County, WA, . Walla Walla County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2019 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWalla Walla County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Report by Plaintiff's |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Petition for Limited Admission |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion | |
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Scott L Jensen |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.