Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Aeroview Property Owners Association, filed a(n) Inj Injunction case represented by O'Day, Stephanie Johnson, Talevich, Peter Anthony, against Interisland Propane, Llc, represented by Higginson, Carla Jean, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts with Evan P. Jones presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEvan P. Jones Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2019 |
CategoryInj Injunction |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Trial | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Continuance Stipulated |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Readiness Hearing | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Trial Date | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Reconsideration & Awarding Partial Summary Judgment Judge: Jones, Evan |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Court's Ruling on Reconsideration |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter re: Trial Setting |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Trial Date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.