Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nelson, Jennifer, Nelson, Ella, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Beauregard, Lincoln Charles, against Rosario Signal Llc Rosario Resort & Spa, represented by Morisset, Catharine M, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2019 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order of Dismissal |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing for Presentation of n Order Granting Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order in Part Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Email Striking Presentation of Order |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendant's for Presentation of an Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Protective Order in Part |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order |
|
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Actual Proceeding Time | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.