Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Amaro, John, Amaro, Rami, Pacific Crossing, Llc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Amaro, Rami, Gardiner, Hamilton H, against Lawson, Leah, Lawson, Thomas, Richard Lawson Llc, represented by Higginson, Carla Jean, Lee, Mark J., in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts with Kathryn C. Loring presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathryn C. Loring Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 02, 2018 |
CategoryPrp Property Damages |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Trial | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Consent Decree |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Hearing Minutes Island County |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings Consent Decree |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Entry of Consent Decree based on settlement agreement |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Limited |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Presentation of Consent Decree |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.