Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Westcott Bay Shellfish Company Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Goddu, Peter William, against Jones, Nick And Sarah, Lopez Island Shellfish Hatchery Llc, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 24, 2018 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Default and Default judgment- Original Judge's signature |
|
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Default and default judgment-faxed copy |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Peter Goddu in support of motion for default and default judgment |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Erik Anderson in support of motion for default judgment |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's ex parte motion for order of default and default judgment |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service on Sarah Jones |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service on Wagner Law Offices |
|
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint for Breach of Contract and Money Due |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.