Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Holland, David, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Myers, Michael David, against Washington State Parks And Recreation Comm, represented by Smith, Newell David, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts with Kathryn C. Loring presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathryn C. Loring Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2017 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Letter Transmittal of check dated 5/31/19 |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Petition
Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Michael Myers in Support |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Disburse Funds |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Stipulated Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Summary Judgment | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Courts Decision Letter Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Actual Proceeding Time | |
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.