Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2017 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 112: NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE; 05-15-2017; 4DY NON JURY TRIAL; |
|
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) -: NOTICE OF HEARING; 04-14-2017; READINESS HEARING; |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Agreement 115: AGREEMENT - CR2A SETTLEMENT; |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order 116: ORDER DETERMINING RIGHTS IN; PARTITION; |
|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter 114: LETTER FROM COURT ADM TO COUNSEL; |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 113: STIPULATION RE SETTLMENT CONFERNCE; JUDGE; |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial Date 112: NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE; 05-15-2017; 4DY NON JURY TRIAL; |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing -: NOTICE OF HEARING; 04-14-2017; READINESS HEARING; |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate 110: CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC TRANS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.