Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kriete, Birgit, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Daheim, Matthew, against San Juan County, Asher, Jeffery & Tmcct, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2016 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) -: NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE; 12-11-2017; 2DY JT 12/11 THRU 12/12 2ND SET; |
|
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 17: NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE -AMENDED; 12-04-2017; 4DY JT 12-4 THRU 12/7 2ND SET; |
|
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) -: ORDER SETTING; 12-04-2017; 5DY JURY TRIAL; |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) -: NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE; 11-03-2017; READINESS HEARING; |
|
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 19: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 09-08-2017; 1:30 DEF ANSWER AND SJSHERIFF; OFFICE MTN FOR SUMMARY JDGMT; |
|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 26: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; |
|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 16: STP ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL; 08-21-2017; READINESS HEARING; |
|
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Email 25: EMAIL STRIKING TRIAL DATE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.