Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Rahlfs, Roger Edward, against Arnold, John Doe, Arnold, Laura L, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2015 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Application For Writ of Garnishment |
|
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
October 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 25: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
October 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 26: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 23: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 24: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 22: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 21: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.