Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Davos Capital Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Sorensen, Rock C, against Fischer, Michael, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 16, 2015 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 11: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 10-16-2015; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY; JUDGMENT; |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment 14: JUDGMENT; |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Summary 15: JUDGMENT SUMMARY; |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 13: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 12: STIPULATION TO ENTRY OF; MONEY JUDGMENT; |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 11: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 10-16-2015; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY; JUDGMENT; |
|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability 10: NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: Sorensen, Rock C; |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 5: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 05-29-2015; MOTION FOR DEFAULT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.