Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Scott, Shannon K, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Schmidt, Bretta, in the jurisdiction of Pend Oreille County, WA, . Pend Oreille County, WA Superior Courts with Patrick A. Monasmith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick A. Monasmith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2018 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPend Oreille County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Supplemental Proceeding | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 03/25 BONNER COUNTY |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Contempt & ORD CONT SUPP PROCEEDINGS Judge: Monasmith, Patrick A |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Monasmith, Patrick A |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Supplemental Proceeding | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.