Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Bittner, Ashley Brianna, against Goodenough, Roberta, in the jurisdiction of Pend Oreille County, WA, . Pend Oreille County, WA Superior Courts with Robin R. McCroskey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin R. McCroskey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2018 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPend Oreille County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of NonMilitary Service | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Application FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant
Judge: McCroskey, Robin R |
|
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Application FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT |
|
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment SECOND |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.