Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Benitez, Shawna, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Williams, David Andrews, against D B A Summit Pacific Medical Center, Grays Harbor County Public Hospital District #1, represented by Gardner, Joseph Vickers, in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts with David L. Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid L. Edwards Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12
Judge: Edwards, David L |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice Stipulation Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12
Judge: Edwards, David L |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Scheduling Judge: Svoboda, Katherine L |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order for Continuance |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Continuance of Trial Date agreed Judge: Svoboda, Katherine L |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order on witness disclosure Judge: Svoboda, Katherine L |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.