Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Winkle Enterprises Llc, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Scanlon, Robert Charles, Smyth, Jeffrey Alan, against D B A Jjy Enterprises Llc, D B A Scoops Ice Cream And Coffee, Yonich, John, represented by Osborn, Simeon, in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts with David L. Mistachkin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid L. Mistachkin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Order of Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply to Counter Claim | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Agreement | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court NonAppearance | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Edwards, David L |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.