Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Bailey, Chelcie, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Ide, Matthew James, against Ghch Physician Services Llc, Grays Harbor Community Hospital, Grays Harbor County Public Hospital District No.2, represented by Barnao, James Anthony, Hineline, Curt Roy, in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts with David L. Mistachkin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid L. Mistachkin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 19, 2020 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Proposed Order |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Final Order and Judgment Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Settlement
Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion and Affidavit Declaration | |
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Copy Attorney Application and Fee Paid |
|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Limited Admission Judge: Edwards, David L |
|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion and Affidavit Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.