Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Anger, Karma, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Campbell, Scott Alan, against Coastal Internal Medicine, Pllc, Pacific Care And Rehabilitation Center, represented by Forbis, Amy Thompson, in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts with David L. Mistachkin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid L. Mistachkin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2020 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice Stipulation and Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Mandate | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated
Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit Andrew C Schuh |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule
Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Transmittal Letter Copy Filed | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Designation of Clerks Papers |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.