Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gossage, Henry, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Dobbins, Jeremey Donn, against Fancher, Thomas, Realty Homes Inc, represented by Selby, Leland Clay, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2020 |
CategoryPrp Property Damages |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Receipts Change of Venue from Pierce Co. |
|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter CHANGE OF VENUE TO PIERCE CO. |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Change of Venue | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Change of Venue
Judge: Brown, Stephen E |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.