We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Ontiveros Vs Scarini

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Ontiveros, John, Ontiveros, Stacy, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Mason, Joseph, Scarini, Heath, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .

Case Details

Filing Date

December 11, 2007

Last Refreshed

November 02, 2020

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Breach Of Contract/Warranty

Practice Area

Commercial

Matter Type

Breach of Contract

Case Cycle Time

346 days

Time to First Dismissal Order

339 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

Date: 2008-03-12T00:00:00

Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

Date: 2007-12-19T00:00:00

First Amended Complaint Filed

Date: 2008-03-12T00:00:00

Default Court Judgment Entered

Date: November 14, 2008

Motion to Amend Complaint Granted

Date: 2008-03-11T00:00:00

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event Abstract of Judgment Issued
Docket Event Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Docket Event Initial Case Management Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 512 date: 12/04/2008 time: 08:30 AM
Docket Event Judgment Entered
Docket Event Default Court Judgment
Docket Event Default Court Judgment Entered
Docket Event Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Entered
Docket Event Application Re: Entry of Judgment Granted
Docket Event Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed
Docket Event Application Re: Entry of Judgment Filed for Stacy Ontiveros, John Ontiveros
See all events