Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lopez, Jose De Jesus, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Campos, Maricela Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Vacation | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Counter-Petition | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Respondent's Original Answer | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Entry Of Appearance | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Campos, Maricela Lynn Served 04/16/2021 Returned 04/16/2021 | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.