Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jones, Kimberly, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Glenn M. Starks, against Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Martin, Jeff, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Larson, Ryan D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLarson, Ryan D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryDamage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal Mailed | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Agreed Order of Dismissal | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit Mailed | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Partial Nonsuit | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Demand |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.