Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Matthew W Cooper, against Akers, Joshua, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Lambeth, Betsy F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLambeth, Betsy F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Nonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit Mailed | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Nonsuit | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Akers, Joshua Served 04/16/2021 Returned 04/16/2021 | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Akers, Joshua Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.