Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Langley, Lisa, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Rian Butler, against El Monumento Restaurant, Monument Cafe Group, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Lambeth, Betsy F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLambeth, Betsy F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryOther Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit Mailed | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Case Settled CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) Case Settled |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing Case Settled CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (4:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) Case Settled |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Certification(s) | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Vacation | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Deposition Certificate | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.