Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Herc Rentals, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Heather L Winkles, against Integrated Environmental Llc, Jones, Jimmy, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Lambeth, Betsy F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLambeth, Betsy F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Jones, Jimmy Served 05/01/2021 Returned 05/10/2021 Integrated Environmental LLC Served 05/01/2021 Returned 05/10/2021 | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Jones, Jimmy Unserved Integrated Environmental LLC Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.