Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Russell, Jordan Michelle, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carl R Knickerbocker, against Hymans, Allen, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Larson, Ryan D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLarson, Ryan D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryDamage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal Mailed | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Agreed Order of Dismissal | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Deposition | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Demand | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Original Answer | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Hymans, Allen Served 03/27/2021 Returned 03/29/2021 | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.