Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mccoy , Jasmine, Washington , Dentray, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Flores Roberto Thomas, against Central Texas Refuse Llc, Moore , Willie, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: October 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED Event Code: 5601 | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS CENTRAL TEXAS REFUSE, LLC AND WILL MOORE?S NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code: 8225 | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CVD:FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (OCA) Event Code: 4619 | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED Event Code: 5601 | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CLS:PARTY DISPO Event Code: 4690 Party: Plaintiff MCCOY, JASMINE | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' NO EVIDENCE MOTION F OR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code: 5554 Party: Defendant MOORE, WILLIE | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER PLAINTIFF JASMINE MCCOY?S NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE Event Code: 8225 Party: Plaintiff MCCOY, JASMINE | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION DEFENDANTS CENTRAL TEXAS REFUSE L.L.C. AND WILLIE MOORE?S NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code: 5265 Party: Defendant CENTRAL TEXAS REFUSE LLC | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL Event Code: 8225 | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION REMOTE ORAL DEPOSITION OF DENTRAY RANDY WASHINGTON Event Code: 5415 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.