Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Degrasse Donald D., against Eyster , Donna, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE RETURN MAIL NOTICE OF ORDER Event Code: 5554 Party: Defendant EYSTER, DONNA | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED Event Code: 5601 | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE Event Code: 8225 | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CVD:DISMISSAL/NONSUIT (OCA) Event Code: 4615 | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE Event Code: 5265 Party: Plaintiff AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE UNSIGNED ORDER/PROPOSED ORDER Event Code: 5415 | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:CITATION ISSUE Event Code: 702 Adjmt Amount: 8.00 Party: Plaintiff AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:GN CIVIL PETITION Event Code: 600 Adjmt Amount: 307.00 Party: Plaintiff AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NEW:ORIGINAL PETITION/APPL (OCA) Event Code: 4500 | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | EXPEDITE ORIG PET RULE 169 PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION Event Code: 5049 Party: Plaintiff AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.