Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weatherford, Roxanne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Weatherford, William, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF ASSIGNMENT BY THE PRESIDING JUDGE Aleta D. Hacker Aleta D. Hacker |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Goodwin, Brad) 09/30/2020 Reset by Court to 10/21/2020 10/02/2020 Reset by Court to 09/30/2020 | |
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer Respondent's Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO APPEAR REMOTELY AT HEARING ON TEMPORARY ORDERS REMOTELY AT HEARING ON TEMPORARY ORDERS |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Continuance | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation & Precept to Serve Weatherford, William Unserved | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS AND ORDER TO APPEAR VIA ZOOM NOTICE OF HEARING NOTICE OF HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS AND ORDER TO APPEAR VIA ZOOM |
|
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO APPEAR REMOTELY AT HEARING ON TEMPORARY ORDERS REMOTELY AT HEARING ON TEMPORARY ORDERS |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition for Divorce v2 Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.