Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martin, Raven Rae, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hemphill, Kevin Scott, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2020 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Information Sheet TCIC TCIC |
|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | CERT./KIDS SAKE - PET/MVNT | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY ORDERS | |
June 07, 2020 | Docket Event | PROTECTIVE ORDER (PENDING CASE) | |
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Goodwin, Brad) | |
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Extension of Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order and Continuance of Hearing Granting Extension of Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order and Continuance of Hearing |
|
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Goodwin, Brad) | |
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Case called for hearing on Petitioner's Application for Protective Order, TRO and TO; Petitioner and attorneys Randol Stout appeared via Zoom; Respondent, Kevin Hemphill, appeared pro se via Zoom; Respondent requested additional time to hire an attorney, James Sadler; Request granted but Protective Order and TRO extended and all Orders remain in effect; All parties given notice of next hearing via Zoom on 5/28/20 at 9:00am; All parties acknowledged orders still in effect and requirement to appear at next hearing; Mr. Stout will prepare order extending Temporary Protective Order and TRO for Court's signature. BG/dh Case called for hearing on Petitioner's Application for Protective Order, TRO and TO; Petitioner and attorneys Randol Stout appeared via Zoom; Respondent, Kevin Hemphill, appeared pro se via Zoom; Respondent requested additional time to hire an attorney, James Sadler; Request granted but Protective Order and TRO extended and all Orders remain in effect; All parties given notice of next hearing via Zoom on 5/28/20 at 9:00am; All parties acknowledged orders still in effect and requirement to appear at next hearing; Mr. Stout will prepare order extending Temporary Protective Order and TRO for Court's signature. BG/dh |
|
May 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
SCANNED CIT/PRECEPT/NOTICE, ETC citation/precept on Kevin Scott Hemphill citation/precept on Kevin Scott Hemphill |
|
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
SCANNED CIT/PRECEPT/NOTICE, ETC protective order protective order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.