Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dupree, Shianne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dupree, Cody, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 22, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Temporary Restraining Order and Order Setting Hearing for Additional Temp Orders Temporary Restraining Order and Order Setting Hearing for Additional Temp Orders |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Additional Temporary Orders for Additional Temporary Orders |
|
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Hearing Agreed Resolution CANCELED Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Goodwin, Brad) Agreed Resolution |
|
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT LETTER | |
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery | |
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER |
|
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Continuance | |
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable 5-1-20 -Case set for TO hearings and Respondent requested more time to hire Jessica Skinner; Petitioner's atty, Randol Stout, agreed; If TO hearing is needed, either party will contact court for date for hearing and submit setting order with specific date received from the court. BG 5-1-20 -Case set for TO hearings and Respondent requested more time to hire Jessica Skinner; Petitioner's atty, Randol Stout, agreed; If TO hearing is needed, either party will contact court for date for hearing and submit setting order with specific date received from the court. BG |
|
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Hearing Other CANCELED Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Goodwin, Brad) Other |
|
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Goodwin, Brad) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.