Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia, Ashley Nicole, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts with Jay K. Weatherby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJay K. Weatherby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Divorce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Weatherby, Jay) | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable FINAL HEARING (With Kids) (X) Via ZOOM Reported by: Cindy Saunders Petitioner: (X) Present () In person (X) Pro Se; Respondent: (X) Present () In person (X) Pro Se; DECREE APPROVED BY: (X) Petitioner; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE: (X) All Parties ready (X) Evidence heard (X) Divorce Granted. FOR KIDS’ SAKE: (X) Both Parents () Mother () Father () Other CONSERVATORSHIP: (X) Parents named JMC; (X) She named Primary JMC with right to designate primary residence of the child/children (X) without regard to geographical limits CHILD SUPPORT: No support ordered; () Health Insurance per Sec. 154.182 TFC to be provided by () He () She () Medical support (X) Uninsured medical expenses to be split 50/50 VISITATION: (X) Standard Possession Order () As set forth on the record and in the decree () Other: PROPERTY AND DEBTS are divided: (X) per Agreed Decree of Divorce () per settlement agreement as announced on record () per Agreement Incident to Divorce (X) to party in possession () as noted on inventory in file CHANGE OF NAME: () Petitioner's/Respondent's name changed to: N/A (X) Decree of Divorce signed FINAL HEARING (With Kids) (X) Via ZOOM Reported by: Cindy Saunders Petitioner: (X) Present () In person (X) Pro Se; Respondent: (X) Present () In person (X) Pro Se; DECREE APPROVED BY: (X) Petitioner; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE: (X) All Parties ready (X) Evidence heard (X) Divorce Granted. FOR KIDS’ SAKE: (X) Both Parents () Mother () Father () Other CONSERVATORSHIP: (X) Parents named JMC; (X) She named Primary JMC with right to designate primary residence of the child/children (X) without regard to geographical limits CHILD SUPPORT: No support ordered; () Health Insurance per Sec. 154.182 TFC to be provided by () He () She () Medical support (X) Uninsured medical expenses to be split 50/50 VISITATION: (X) Standard Possession Order () As set forth on the record and in the decree () Other: PROPERTY AND DEBTS are divided: (X) per Agreed Decree of Divorce () per settlement agreement as announced on record () per Agreement Incident to Divorce (X) to party in possession () as noted on inventory in file CHANGE OF NAME: () Petitioner's/Respondent's name changed to: N/A (X) Decree of Divorce signed |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
FINAL DECREE - AGREED (OCA) Certified copy to petitioner 10/14/20 Certified copy to petitioner 10/14/20 |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Zoom Hearing | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | CERT.-KIDS SAKE - DEF/RESPT | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | CERT./KIDS SAKE - PET/MVNT | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Note (Public) No KId's Sake Cert - not able to set. No KId's Sake Cert - not able to set. |
|
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR HEARING | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | WAIVER | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.