Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sisk, Alvie Paul, Jr., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts with Jay K. Weatherby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJay K. Weatherby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Copy Returned | |
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Divorce (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Weatherby, Jay) 05/29/2020 Reset by Court to 06/05/2020 | |
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable FINAL HEARING (No Kids) - VIA ZOOM Reported by: N/A Petitioner: (X) Present (X) In person (X) Pro Se; Respondent: (X) Present (X) In person (X) Pro Se; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE: (X) All Parties ready (X) Evidence heard (X) Divorce Granted. CHILDREN: (X) No children of the marriage () No children now under 18 PROPERTY AND DEBTS are divided: (X) per Final Decree of Divorce () per settlement agreement as announced on record (X) to party in possession () as noted on inventory in file CHANGE OF NAME: () Petitioner/Respondent's name changed to: N/A (X) Decree of Divorce to be prepared by Petitioner FINAL HEARING (No Kids) - VIA ZOOM Reported by: N/A Petitioner: (X) Present (X) In person (X) Pro Se; Respondent: (X) Present (X) In person (X) Pro Se; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE: (X) All Parties ready (X) Evidence heard (X) Divorce Granted. CHILDREN: (X) No children of the marriage () No children now under 18 PROPERTY AND DEBTS are divided: (X) per Final Decree of Divorce () per settlement agreement as announced on record (X) to party in possession () as noted on inventory in file CHANGE OF NAME: () Petitioner/Respondent's name changed to: N/A (X) Decree of Divorce to be prepared by Petitioner |
|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL DECREE - AGREED (OCA) | |
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING RESET RESET |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Note (Public) NOH mailed to: DEBORAHANN MICHELLE LOWE 311 N BELL ST LOT# 17 SAN ANGELO TX 76903 NOH mailed to: DEBORAHANN MICHELLE LOWE 311 N BELL ST LOT# 17 SAN ANGELO TX 76903 |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | WAIVER | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR HEARING Q 3/16/20 Q 3/16/20 |
|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.