Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Warner, Susan Christine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Warner, Raymond Leroy, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL DECREE - DEFAULT (Judicial Officer: Woodward, Ben ) | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judicial Docket Entries Final Hearing (GBW/LD). Pet here pro se; Respondent defaulted. Heard Evidence. Grant divorce; find there are no children of the marriage. Award property to party in possession; insurance to the insured; retirement to the party that earned the benefit. Debts are to be paid by the party that incurred the debt. No name change. Signed Decree. Final Hearing (GBW/LD). Pet here pro se; Respondent defaulted. Heard Evidence. Grant divorce; find there are no children of the marriage. Award property to party in possession; insurance to the insured; retirement to the party that earned the benefit. Debts are to be paid by the party that incurred the debt. No name change. Signed Decree. |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Default Judgment (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Woodward, Ben) | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR ZOOM HEARING Default Hearing Default Hearing |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Information Sheet VS Form VS Form |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR HEARING | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Setting Hearing Order Setting Hearing |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | SCANNED CIT/PRECEPT/NOTICE, ETC | |
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation WARNER, RAYMOND LEROY Served 07/01/2020 Returned 07/22/2020 | |
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.