Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cisneros, Daniel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Saldivar, Amanda, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL DECREE - DEFAULT | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodward, Ben) | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Final Hearing, GBW/LD. Petitioner here with R. Stout; Respondent defaulted. Heard evidence. Grant divorce. Find are 3 children. Appt Father as sole m/c; Mother is P/C but limit here rights for reasons on record. Mother pays c/s @ $600/month beg 10/1/2020 and Father is to provide health care insurance. Award F a judgment for $2,700 past child support to accrue interest and is payable at $50/month beginning Oct 1, 2020 Award property to party in possession; insurance to the insured; retirement to the party that earned the benefit. Debts are to be paid by the party that incurred the debt. Signed Decree and tatement of the evidence. Final Hearing, GBW/LD. Petitioner here with R. Stout; Respondent defaulted. Heard evidence. Grant divorce. Find are 3 children. Appt Father as sole m/c; Mother is P/C but limit here rights for reasons on record. Mother pays c/s @ $600/month beg 10/1/2020 and Father is to provide health care insurance. Award F a judgment for $2,700 past child support to accrue interest and is payable at $50/month beginning Oct 1, 2020 Award property to party in possession; insurance to the insured; retirement to the party that earned the benefit. Debts are to be paid by the party that incurred the debt. Signed Decree and tatement of the evidence. |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR ZOOM HEARING | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Final Decree of Divorce Final Decree of Divorce |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing Vacate CANCELED Final Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodward, Ben) Vacate |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | EMPLOYER'S ORDER WITHHOLDING EARNINGS (Judicial Officer: Woodward, Ben ) | |
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order to Withhold- Not sent to Queue Order to Withhold- Not sent to Queue |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Regarding Audio/Video Remote Hearings Order Order Regarding Audio/Video Remote Hearings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.