Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vallejo, Crystal Gail, filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2020 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER CHANGING NAME OF A CHILD OF A CHILD |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Name Change (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Dusek, Carmen) | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING RESET NOTICE OF HEARING RESET NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Case called on Zoom. Pet did not appear and had not accepted Zoom invitation. CSD Case called on Zoom. Pet did not appear and had not accepted Zoom invitation. CSD |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Name Change (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Dusek, Carmen) | |
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Zoom Hearing NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING / ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN ZOOM HEARINGS IN THE 51ST JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT OF TEXAS NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING / ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN ZOOM HEARINGS IN THE 51ST JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT OF TEXAS |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice -FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE AND TERMINATION OF PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP - FROM HOWARD COUNTY -FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE AND TERMINATION OF PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP - FROM HOWARD COUNTY |
|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
CONSENT CHILD'S CONSENT TO CHANGE NAME CHILD'S CONSENT TO CHANGE NAME |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.