Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Paramore, Sarah Rose, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Paramore, Douglas Alan, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 03, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Note (Public) 9/30/20 Pet (W) pro se--Resp by waiver and he signed the decree---evidence heard-no children-parties have divided their property each to keep their retirement /401K --divorce granted --BLW/AP 9/30/20 Pet (W) pro se--Resp by waiver and he signed the decree---evidence heard-no children-parties have divided their property each to keep their retirement /401K --divorce granted --BLW/AP |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Divorce (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Dusek, Carmen) 10/02/2020 Reset by Court to 09/30/2020 | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING RESET NOTICE OF HEARING RESET NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR HEARING SENT TO Q-3/9/2020 SENT TO Q-3/9/2020 |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SERVICE |
|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.