Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Angelo Superior Services, Inc. Dba Superior Services, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Paul D. Stipanovic, against Outlier Dairy, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 17, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | WRIT RETURNED | |
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Outlier Dairy, LLC Unserved | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR SERVICE WRIT OF EXECUTION WRIT OF EXECUTION |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Hearing conducted on Zoom video meeting from TG Courtroom. Pl rep present w/ P. Stipanovik; def representative personally served w/ citation & petition but no anser has been filed. Evid. heard. Ct took judicial notice of case file, including affidavits therein. Judgement granted for Pl. Proposed Judgment signed. CSD/cw Hearing conducted on Zoom video meeting from TG Courtroom. Pl rep present w/ P. Stipanovik; def representative personally served w/ citation & petition but no anser has been filed. Evid. heard. Ct took judicial notice of case file, including affidavits therein. Judgement granted for Pl. Proposed Judgment signed. CSD/cw |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Default Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Dusek, Carmen) | |
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
JE Docket Entry Docketable Ct called case on Zoom for default hearing. Pl present thru Monte Greathouse and atty P Stipanovick. Def served w/ citation in all capacities but has not answered or otherwise appeared. Evid. heard. Ct granted Judgment for Pl. CSD/cw Ct called case on Zoom for default hearing. Pl present thru Monte Greathouse and atty P Stipanovick. Def served w/ citation in all capacities but has not answered or otherwise appeared. Evid. heard. Ct granted Judgment for Pl. CSD/cw |
|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Zoom Hearing NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order DEFAULT JUDGMENT DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.