Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Davis, Monique, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Eaton, Chad W., against Harvey, Marian, represented by Allen, Zack A, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 439th District Court with Rakow, David E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRakow, David E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMarch 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House439th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Prove Up | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Prove Up | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Prove Up |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.