Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Td Auto Finance, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Olsen-Zhang, Jessica, against Sosa-Lara, Lionel, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, J. Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedJune 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Trial Before the Court | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Process Return |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.