Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ordaz, Ivan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Schorr, Geoffrey E., against Martin, Julia, represented by Bowen, Malik, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHall, Brett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 01, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Nonsuit | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of NonSuit | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Check | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Rule 11 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.