Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gustafson, Chelsea Renea, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gustafson, Eric Steven, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHall, Brett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Response | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.