Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc Assignee Of Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Young, Dan G., against Schwister, Todd J., in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 2 with Woodward, Stephani presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodward, Stephani Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 2 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Process Returned Unserved | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Granting NonSuit | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion To Non-Suit | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter from Judge File Copy | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.