Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Weber Smith, Lauren, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Smith, Samuel Jordan, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHall, Brett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Trial Before the Court | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Deposition | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Decree of Divorce | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Prove Up | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Response | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Mediation Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.