Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cash Special Utility District, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Bradbury, Jim D., against Hoyos, Joel, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHall, Brett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Eminent Domain |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Granting NonSuit | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of NonSuit | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Process Return | |
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | No Fee Document | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Oath | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.