Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Southwestern Bell Telephone Company D B A At&T Texas, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Ray L. Vela, against Pathwayz Communications, Inc., Terrpath Construction, Llc, represented by Kerry Mclain, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION OF COST AND NECESSITY OF SERVICES OF WILLIAM "SCOTT" HOLTSLANDER OF FILING DECLARATION OF COST AND NECESSITY OF SERVICES OF WILLIAM "SCOTT" HOLTSLANDER |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER ORIGINAL ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS - FILED BY ATTORNEY KERRY MCLAIN ORIGINAL ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS - FILED BY ATTORNEY KERRY MCLAIN |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER / VACATION SCHEDULE ATTORNEY RAY L. VELA - JUNE 14, 2021 - JUNE 24, 2021 AND OCTOBER 7, 2021 - OCTOBER 14, 2021 ATTORNEY RAY L. VELA - JUNE 14, 2021 - JUNE 24, 2021 AND OCTOBER 7, 2021 - OCTOBER 14, 2021 |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED TERRAPATH ON 3-11-21 TERRAPATH ON 3-11-21 |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED PATHWAYZ ON 3-11-21 PATHWAYZ ON 3-11-21 |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED PATHWAYZ COMMUNICATIONS - EFILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE PATHWAYZ COMMUNICATIONS - EFILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED TERRAPATH CONSTRUCTION - EFILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE TERRAPATH CONSTRUCTION - EFILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL SCHEDULE REVIEW-18 Months | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.