Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcbride, Amanda, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Robert F. Kalinke, against Estate Of Michael Duane Brown, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | FRIENDLY SUIT (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Barbara Younger, C.S.R. , Plaintiff and attorney Robert Kalinke appeared via zoom. Defendant's attorney Chuck Mallard appeared via zoom. Ad litem - David Russell appeared via zoom. Plaintiff called Amanda McBride - sworn and testified. Settlement approved. Barbara Younger, C.S.R. , Plaintiff and attorney Robert Kalinke appeared via zoom. Defendant's attorney Chuck Mallard appeared via zoom. Ad litem - David Russell appeared via zoom. Plaintiff called Amanda McBride - sworn and testified. Settlement approved. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | FRIENDLY SUIT (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
PETITION OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - FILED BY ATTORNEY DAVID M. RUSSELL OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - FILED BY ATTORNEY DAVID M. RUSSELL |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM - ATTY DAVID RUSSELL FOR DYLAN APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM - ATTY DAVID RUSSELL FOR DYLAN |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION AGREED MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR W.S., A MINOR AGREED MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR W.S., A MINOR |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL SCHEDULE REVIEW-18 Months |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.