Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cornerstone Synergy, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Douglas Brooking, against Gw Communications Solutions, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE E-FILED TO ATTORNEY E-FILED TO ATTORNEY |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED NOTICE GW COMMUNICATIONS GW COMMUNICATIONS |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NONSUIT (OCA) 1 PAGE SIGNED ON 12-30-2020 1 PAGE SIGNED ON 12-30-2020 |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ON PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT AGAINST DEFENDANT - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ON PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT AGAINST DEFENDANT - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NONSUIT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED GW COMMUNICATIONS ON 12-2-2020 GW COMMUNICATIONS ON 12-2-2020 |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED GW COMMUNICATIONS SOLUTIONS, LLC - EFILED TO allison.covey@sprouselaw.com FOR SERVICE GW COMMUNICATIONS SOLUTIONS, LLC - EFILED TO allison.covey@sprouselaw.com FOR SERVICE |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | CIVIL SCHEDULE REVIEW-18 Months | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.