Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brake, Victoria Priesley, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Brake, Landen Gage, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Titiana D. Frausto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTitiana D. Frausto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 20, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Order (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Frausto, Titiana) | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Case called via Zoom. Pet. present with counsel and announced ready, Respondent did not appear. Court took JN of service. Pet name temp. SMC, Resp. ordered to submit to hair follicle drug testing before visitation is awarded. Parties awarded temporary exclusive use of items in their possession. Case called via Zoom. Pet. present with counsel and announced ready, Respondent did not appear. Court took JN of service. Pet name temp. SMC, Resp. ordered to submit to hair follicle drug testing before visitation is awarded. Parties awarded temporary exclusive use of items in their possession. |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED LANDEN BRAKE - 11/24/2020 LANDEN BRAKE - 11/24/2020 |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING 12/9/2020 AT 1:30 PM VIA ZOOM 12/9/2020 AT 1:30 PM VIA ZOOM |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED LANDEN BRAKE - EFILED TO ATTY LANDEN BRAKE - EFILED TO ATTY |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | FAMILY SCHEDULE REVIEW-9 Months | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.