Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Moore, Gregory, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Moore, Tamara, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
ANSWER RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER AND COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE - FILED BY ATTORNEY WADE A. BYRD RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER AND COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE - FILED BY ATTORNEY WADE A. BYRD |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED TAMARA MOORE ON 11-7-2020 TAMARA MOORE ON 11-7-2020 |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
PRECEPT SERVED TAMARA MOORE ON 11-7-2020 TAMARA MOORE ON 11-7-2020 |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED TAMARA MOORE - EFILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE TAMARA MOORE - EFILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
ISSUED PRECEPT TAMARA MOORE - SENT TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE TAMARA MOORE - SENT TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED NOTICE OF HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED NOTICE OF HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE PETITION AND NOTICE OF HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS PETITION AND NOTICE OF HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS - 5 PAGES SIGNED ON 11-3-2020 FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS - 5 PAGES SIGNED ON 11-3-2020 |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | FAMILY SCHEDULE REVIEW-9 Months |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.